Fuller, Benjamin Royce (CPSO#: 59879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 623-5679
Fax: (905) 623-1345
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Fuller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2016


Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Fuller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fuller ( CPSO# 59879 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-5679

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 29 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN ROYCE FULLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FULLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989