Fuller, Hugh Dermott (CPSO#: 29436)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Josephs Healthcare 50 Charlton Avenue East Hamilton, ON L8W 4A6
Date Received: 21 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015