Fullerton, James Edwin David (CPSO#: 68974)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
130 Lansdowne Avenue
Carleton Place ON  K7C 2T7
Phone: (613) 257-4793
Fax: (613) 257-4794
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carleton Place District and
Memorial Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Stone Ridge Nursing Home
256 High Street
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1X1
Canada
Phone: (613) 257-4355
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Fullerton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fullerton ( CPSO# 68974 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
130 Lansdown Avenue
Carleton Place ON  K7C 2T7
Phone Number: (613) 257-4793

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES EDWIN DAVID FULLERTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FULLERTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997