Fullerton, Louise Elizabeth (CPSO#: 54413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Health Services
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Colorado

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUISE ELIZABETH FULLERTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FULLERTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1985