Fulthorpe, Gordon Henry John (CPSO#: 20603)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 405, 849 Upper Wentworth Street, Hamilton, ON L9A 5H4
Date Received: 06 May 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016