Fulton, Tanya Lee (CPSO#: 103126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Nadon, Tanya Lee (used until: 26 Oct 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Little Lake Health Centre
11 Lakeside Terrace
Suite 201
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: 7058819810
Fax: 7058819813
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANYA LEE FULTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FULTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016