Fung, Amy Siu Ling (CPSO#: 64524)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1984

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1996