Fung, Donald Eugene Mun Yee (CPSO#: 33640)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 4350
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donald Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fung ( CPSO# 33640 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Drive
Nipissing ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD EUGENE MUN YEE FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1985