Fung, Filgen Yut-Tou (CPSO#: 97732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
2nd Floor, Room 252
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 76993
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FILGEN YUT-TOU FUNG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FUNG is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. FUNG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FUNG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. FUNG shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FUNG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FUNG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2016 to 01 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 02 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 01 Nov 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 02 Nov 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018