Fung, Hing-Sheung Eugene (CPSO#: 26825)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Taiwan University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 30 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1997