Fung, Irene Ngar Yee (CPSO#: 86810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1278 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 1S3
Phone: (416) 848-9795
Fax: (416) 521-7216
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4A-128 Queen St South
Mississauga ON  L5M 1K8
Canada
Phone: 905-997-7711
Fax: 905-997-7714
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Irene Ngar Yee Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Fung ( CPSO# 86810 )

Business Address:
1278 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 1S3
Phone Number: (416) 848-9795

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 20 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRENE NGAR YEE FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2013