Fung, Jason (CPSO#: 70179)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone: (416) 279-0855 Ext. 246
Fax: (416) 279-0857
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fung ( CPSO# 70179 )

Business Address:
Unit 10
78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone Number: (416) 279-0855

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2001