Fung Kee Fung, Karen Marie Carew (CPSO#: 56106)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: Ash, Karen Marie Carew (used until: 14 Jul 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department Of Obstetrics And
Gynaecology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8551
Fax: (613) 737-8070
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Fung Kee Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fung Kee Fung ( CPSO# 56106 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8551

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 May 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN MARIE CAREW FUNG KEE FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG KEE FUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1991