Fung, Kee Wai (CPSO#: 21853)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:National Defense Medical Center, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 303 - 89 Humber College Blvd Pediatric Group Practice 416-743-6063
Date Received: 11 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017