Fung, Kenneth Po-Lun (CPSO#: 69103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
9 East
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5349
Fax: (416) 603-5661
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mon Sheong Scarborough Long Term
Care Centre
2030 McNicoll Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1V 5P4
Canada
Phone: (416) 291-3898
Fax: (416) 297-8322
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hong Fook Mental Health Association
130 Dundas Street West, 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M7A 2C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 493-4242
Fax: (416) 595-6332
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH PO-LUN FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000