Fung, Michael Ernest Arthur (CPSO#: 32899)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 22 2013


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael E.A. Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016