Fung, Susanna Wing San (CPSO#: 84731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone: (647) 350-0550
Fax: (647) 350-0552
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susanna Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fung ( CPSO# 84731 )

Business Address:
1920 Ellesmere Road
Suite 310
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone Number: (647) 350-0550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSANNA WING SAN FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008