Fung, Wai Lun Alan (CPSO#: 81101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Mental Health Program
4001 Leslie Street, 8 North
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6322
Fax: (416) 756-6424
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Genetics Program
4001 Leslie Street, 3SE
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6345
Fax: (416) 756-6727
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3280 Midland Ave, Unit 22
Toronto ON  M1V 4W9
Canada
Phone: 416-479-7600
Fax: 416-479-7601
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W.L. Alan Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Fung ( CPSO# 81101 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Suite 3 SE
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6345

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Suite 8 North
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 633-9420

Business Address:
Unit 22
3280 Midland Avenue
Toronto ON  M1V 4W9
Phone Number: (416) 479-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAI LUN ALAN FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009