Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Fung, Wai-Keung Steven (CPSO#: 69040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 4164382911 Ext. 6671
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven W. K. Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Fung ( CPSO# 69040 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAI-KEUNG STEVEN FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999