Fung, Wayne Andrew (CPSO#: 79690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
23 Wellington St. East
Guelph ON  N1H 3R7
Phone: (519) 824-8185
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Fung ( CPSO# 79690 )

Business Address:
23 Wellington Street East
Guelph ON  N1H 3R7
Phone Number: (519) 824-8185

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE ANDREW FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2009