Fung, Wing-Tai (CPSO#: 23383)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 29 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Defense Medical Center, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 29 Nov 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Nov 2016
Summary:

On November 29, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Wing-Tai Fung committed an act of professional misconduct in that he 
has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise and in that the 
governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other than Ontario has found that he 
committed an act of professional misconduct that would, in the opinion of the panel, be an act of 
misconduct as defined in the regulations. 
 
Dr. Fung, a family physician, practised in Iowa from 1992 to 2008. Following his retirement 
from his Iowa practice in 2008, he returned to Ontario where he worked until 2014. 
 
On March 27, 2015, Dr. Fung pled guilty in the District Court of Iowa in and for Shelby County 
to the charge of Assault with Intent to Commit Sexual Abuse and Indecent Contact with a Child. 
On that day, he received a two year suspended sentence, was ordered to register as a sex 
offender, to immediately surrender his license to practise medicine, and to submit to DNA 
profiling. Dr. Fung was also ordered to enter into a plan of restitution for the payment of all court 
costs, fines, and victim restitution.  
 
The factual basis of the plea and sentence was an admission by Dr. Fung that he touched a ten-
year-old patient on her inner thigh, during a medical appointment in January 1999, with the 
purpose of arousing himself. Dr. Fung was 66 years old at the time of the offence.   
 
The Iowa State Board of Medicine took action on the basis of the criminal finding. Dr. Fung 
agreed to the voluntary surrender of his licence. The Board delivered a citation and warning and 
imposed a $10,000.00 civil penalty on Dr. Fung.   
 
PENALTY 
 
On November 29, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
   -  The Registrar revoke Dr. Fung’s certificate of registration, effective immediately.  
   -  Dr. Fung appear before the panel to be reprimanded.  
   -  Dr. Fung pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000.00 within thirty (30) days from 
      the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): November 29, 2016