Fung, Yee Tsang (CPSO#: 22025)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 26 Feb 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2010