Fung-Kee-Fung, Michael Paul (CPSO#: 56103)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital
Department Of Obstetrics
And Gynaecology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8560
Fax: (613) 737-8828
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Fung Kee Fung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fung-Kee-Fung ( CPSO# 56103 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8560

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PAUL FUNG-KEE-FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG-KEE-FUNG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1990