Funnell, Sarah Ruth (CPSO#: 100486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2044
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone: 613-562-5413
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2121 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H2
Canada
Phone: 613-761-6777
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

420 Cooper Street
Ottawa ON  K2P2N6
Canada
Phone: 613-233-4697
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH RUTH FUNNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNNELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 08 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 08 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015