Fuoco, Gabriel Gianni Carlo (CPSO#: 74016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
P O Box 4200
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 876-4559
Fax: (705) 876-4558
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gabriel G. Fuoco Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Fuoco ( CPSO# 74016 )

Business Address:
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 876-4559

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABRIEL GIANNI CARLO FUOCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUOCO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2004