Furey, Michael Urban (CPSO#: 54645)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jun 1987