Furlan, Julio Cesar (CPSO#: 90628)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Lyndhurst Centre
520 Sutherland Drive
Room 205
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 14 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIO CESAR FURLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURLAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2016