Furness, Alexander (CPSO#: 19971)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A Furness Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 199 Princess Anne Drive Georgetown ON L7G 0E3
Date Received: 09 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017