Furqan, Naila (CPSO#: 83138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
720 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5C 3G1
Phone: (905) 848-8686
Fax: (905) 848-8796
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naila Furqan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Furqan ( CPSO# 83138 )

Business Address:
4 - 790 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5C 4G3
Phone Number: (905) 848-8686

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAILA FURQAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURQAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007