Furst, Katherine Anne (CPSO#: 64250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mental Health Services
525 Montreal Street
Kingston ON  K7K 3H9
Phone: (613) 540-6165 Ext. 4314
Fax: (613) 540-6169
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE ANNE FURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 11 Aug 1997 to 10 Aug 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1992