Furtado, Richard Joseph (CPSO#: 78672)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone: 705-445-2550
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Furtado Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Furtado ( CPSO# 78672 )

Business Address:
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W8
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
1112 St Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-3751

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JOSEPH FURTADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURTADO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Nov 2002 to 18 Dec 2002
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Jul 2003 to 24 Aug 2003
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Nov 2003 to 14 Dec 2003
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Mar 2004 to 01 Apr 2004
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 12 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004