Fuss, Carolyn Lee (CPSO#: 86770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Family Medicine
10 Victoria Street, Unit B
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone: (519) 783-0021
Fax: (519) 783-0031
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carolyn Fuss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fuss ( CPSO# 86770 )

Business Address:
The Centre for Family Medicine
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4X6
Phone Number: (519) 578-2100

Business Address:
The Centre for Family Medicine
10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 783-0021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN LEE FUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009