Fyfe, Alistair Ian (CPSO#: 61713)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 21 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Tasmania, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Oct 1992