Fyfe, Harry (CPSO#: 18902)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1963
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2008