Fyfe, Murray Warner (CPSO#: 61779)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1997