Fyles, Anthony William (CPSO#: 32990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-6522
Fax: (416) 946-2111
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Fyles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fyles ( CPSO# 32990 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Suite 5-984
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-6522

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 03 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY WILLIAM FYLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FYLES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1984