Garneys, Glenn Gordon (CPSO#: 67229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5039
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street South
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Canada
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Garneys Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Garneys ( CPSO# 67229 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street South
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  L9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121


Corporation Name: Aldis, Millitz, Voros Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Elyas ( CPSO# 90679 )
Dr. F. Abdelsayed ( CPSO# 100533)
Dr. E. Ng ( CPSO# 90845 )
Dr. P. Wilson ( CPSO# 74749 )
Dr. M. Voros ( CPSO# 73634 )
Dr. R. Sobiera ( CPSO# 65094 )
Dr. W. Myint ( CPSO# 67814 )
Dr. K. Millitz ( CPSO# 63758 )
Dr. S. Millward ( CPSO# 54715 )
Dr. K. King ( CPSO# 78979 )
Dr. G. Garneys ( CPSO# 67229 )
Dr. H. Aldis ( CPSO# 31600 )
Dr. D. Bourgeois ( CPSO# 54466 )
Dr. S. Harvie ( CPSO# 87296 )

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Diagnostic Imaging Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5039

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-3111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENN GORDON GARNEYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARNEYS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1994