Gaba, Priya (CPSO#: 83955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Russian

Education:Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: 613-737-8899
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRIYA GABA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GABA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 14 Feb 2006 to 07 May 2006
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 May 2006 to 07 May 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 May 2007 to 07 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 2012