Gaballah, Sameh Elsayed Ibrahim Soliman (CPSO#: 104337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alexandria, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 946-2324
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Sep 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sameh Elsayed Ibrahim Soliman Gaballah may practise medicine only as
                  required by the clinical fellowship program in ophthalmology in which Dr.
                  Gaballah is enrolled in the Department of Ophthalmology, University of
                  Toronto;

            2.    Dr.  Gaballah shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients and out-patients
                  of  a clinical  teaching  unit  that  is  formally  affiliated  with  the
                  department  where  Dr.  Gaballah  is  properly practising medicine and to
                  which postgraduate trainees are regularly  assigned  by the department as
                  part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

            3.    Dr. Gaballah shall not charge a fee for medical services; and

            4.    The certificate expires on June 30, 2018.