Gabay, Jose Israel (CPSO#: 21016)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Madrid, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For copy of records please contact Dr. Gabay at 905-270-2713
Date Received: 17 Jan 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2012