Gabel, Nancy Ann (CPSO#: 52804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0750
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Gabel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gabel ( CPSO# 52804 )

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0750

Business Address:
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 768-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY ANN GABEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GABEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Nov 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1996