Gabor, Andrew (CPSO#: 23282)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian, Romanian

Education:Peter Pazmany University of Budapest, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002