Gabrielle, Denis Michael Stephen (CPSO#: 27379)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 14 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jul 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1995
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1995
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 25 Feb 1998
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 14 Jul 2000

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jul 2000
Summary:

 On July 14, 2000, the Discipline Committee of the College found Dr. Gabrielle guilty of 
 professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession 
 and engaged in conduct that would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable 
 or unprofessional. In addition, the committee found him incompetent. Subsequently, the Committee 
 ordered that Dr. Gabrielle be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
 register. The Committee ordered his Certificate of Registration be revoked immediately.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 11, 2000


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Mar 1995
Summary:

In March 1995, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Gabrielle guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(29) of 
Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, and in s. 29(30) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he committed 
sexual impropriety with a patient.    The Committee further found Dr. Gabrielle guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in 
s. 51(1)(b. 1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, as 
amended, in that he had sexually abused a patient.    The Committee further found him incompetent, as defined in s. 61(4) of 
the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill 
or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in 
practice.    The Committee further found Dr. Gabrielle incompetent, as defined in s. 52(1) of the Health Professions Procedural 
Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, as amended, in that his professional care of a patient 
displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that 
demonstrates that he is unfit to continue to practice or that his practice should be restricted.    Consequently, the Committee 
imposed the following penalty: 
 
   1. Dr. Gabrielle was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. 
 
   2. Dr. Gabrielle s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of eighteen months. 
 
   3. At the conclusion of this period of suspension, Dr. Gabrielle s licence was to be restricted for an indefinite period of 
      time, such that he be restricted to assisting at surgery at the hospital at which he had privileges. 
 
   4. Any removal of the restriction on Dr. Gabrielle s licence imposed under paragraph 3 cited above was to be done by 
      application to the Discipline Committee, and, to be successful, would have to satisfy the following criteria: 
 
      (a) At least one year was to have elapsed since the date on which this Order became final; 
 
      (b) Dr. Gabrielle must have demonstrated that he understood the nature and significance of his unacceptable 
          conduct; 
 
      (c) Dr. Gabrielle must have participated in a program of ongoing, twice-monthly psychiatric treatments at his own 
          expense, commencing at the conclusion of his period of suspension; 
 
      (d) A thorough psychiatric evaluation must show that Dr. Gabrielle's return to a less restricted practice was 
          compatible with public safety; this evaluation was to be done at the Doctor's own expense by a psychiatrist 
          acceptable to the Registrar who had full knowledge of the findings made by the Discipline Committee; and 
 
      (e) Dr. Gabrielle must have demonstrated that his medical knowledge and skills had been maintained; 
 
   5. In the event of Dr. Gabrielle successfully obtaining the removal of the restrictions cited above in paragraph 3, his 
      licence to practice was thereafter to be restricted indefinitely such that, should he practice in an office or clinical 
      setting, his practice there was to be supervised by another member of the College who was to submit regular 
      quarterly reports to the Registrar, which were to be satisfactory to the Registrar, confirming that supervision had been 
      carried out and that Dr. Gabrielle was perfoming his professional responsibilities in a competent and ethical fashion; 
              
6. Any removal of the restriction on Dr. Gabrielle s licence to practice imposed under paragraph 5 cited above was to be 
   done by application to a panel of the Discipline Committee.    For such application to be successful, Dr. Gabrielle 
   would need to satisfy the following criteria: 
              
   (a) A period of two years must have elapsed since the removal of the restrictions imposed under paragraph 3 cited 
       above; 
              
   (b) Dr. Gabrielle must have demonstrated that, during the period when the restriction imposed under paragraph 5 
       cited above was in place, he had carried out his professional responsibilities in a competent and ethical 
       fashion; and 
              
   (c) A further psychiatric evaluation of Dr. Gabrielle was to have indicated that his return to unrestricted and 
       unsupervised practice was compatible with public safety.    This evaluation was to be done at Dr. Gabrielle's 
       own expense by a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar, who had full knowledge of the Discipline 
       Committee's findings.    

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 09 Jan 1996
Hearing Date(s): Aug 02, 1994