Gadde, Padma (CPSO#: 109892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2016

Expiry Date:  08 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Vijayawada University of Health Sciences, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nixon Medical Centre
301-510 Southdale Rd E
London ON  N6E 0B2
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mill Pond Medical Clinic
106 Victoria St West
Alliston ON  L9R 1L7
Canada
Phone: (705) 435-0080
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Nobleton Medical & Walk-in Clinic
12931 Hwy 27
Nobleton ON  L0G 1N0
Canada
Phone: (905) 859-9998
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 08 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Padma Gadde may pratice paediatrics at: 

                  (i)   Mill  Pond  Medical Clinic in Alliston and the Nobleton Medical and
                        Walk-In  Clinic  in  Nobleton,  Ontario,  while  under  supervision
                        coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and 
                  
                  (iii) Nixon Medical  Centre  in  London, Ontario, while under supervision
                        coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and
                  
                  (iv)  only in accordance with the  Retraining  Program  approved  by  the
                        College.                                                           
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires on June 8, 2019 or
                  when Dr.  Gadde's eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and
                  Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisors  notify  the  College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Gadde's knowledge, skill, judgment  or attitude, do not provide the
                        required reports to the College by the  due  date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisors  are  no  longer able or willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Gadde's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) Dr. Gadde is no longer enrolled in the Retraining Program, or
                  
                  (iv)  the College finds the assessment  report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Gadde's practice unsatisfactory. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on March 19, 2018 and currently has an interim
                  expiry date of June 8, 2019.  The expiry  date of this certificate may be
                  extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.