Gafoor, Mohamed Mursalene (CPSO#: 26423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Apr 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 1974


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pacemaker Clinic
Oakville-Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845 2571 Ext. 6887
Fax: (905) 815 5126
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mursalene Gafoor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2009

Dr. M. Gafoor ( CPSO# 26423 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: 1-888-316-4125 Website:
Date Received: 18 Nov 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville


Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MOHAMED MURSALENE GAFOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAFOOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1974