Gagliano, Anthony (CPSO#: 15941)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Mar 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Messina, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  October 1, 2008
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF RESTRICTIONS OF PRIVILEGES:

On October 23, 2008, Centre for Addiction and Mental Health notified the College that Dr. Anthony Gagliano's privileges are restricted effective October 1, 2008.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1956
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Mar 2011

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 May 2004
Summary:

 On May 4, 2004, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Gagliano committed an act of professional 
 misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine 
 that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional by providing an incorrect date of birth in his 
 application and re-applications for medical staff appointment to the William Osler Heath Centre, 
 in order to make himself appear younger so that he would be accepted as courtesy staff. 

The 
 panel ordered Dr. Gagliano to attend before it to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to be 
 recorded on the Register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 04, 2004

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: March 8, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective March 8, 2011, Dr. Gagliano has resigned from the College and agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.