Gagne, Mylene (CPSO#: 93217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay street
Pembroke ON  K8A1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYLENE GAGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2014