Gagnon, Andre (CPSO#: 31354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Feb 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Jul 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Pierre - Janet
30 Pharand
Gatineau QC  J9A 1K7
Phone: (819) 776-8093
Fax: (819) 771-7195

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., July 16, 2014, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following term, condition
            and limitation is imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Andre
            Gagnon:

                  Dr. Gagnon shall successfully complete, at his own expense and before the
                  end of 2015, education approved by the College regarding boundaries in
                  the doctor-patient relationship.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Jul 2014
Summary:

On July 16, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Andre Gagnon committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other 
than Ontario has found that the member committed an act of professional misconduct that would, 
in the opinion of the panel, be an act of misconduct as defined in the regulations. Dr. Gagnon 
admitted the allegation.  
 
Dr. Gagnon is a psychiatrist who focuses his practice on child and adolescent psychiatry. Dr. 
Gagnon was Patient A's psychiatrist from April 1994, when she was 14 years old, until February 
2009 when Patient A was 28 years old. Dr. Gagnon's treatment of Patient A and interactions with 
Patient A took place in Québec, where he practices medicine. Patient A was a vulnerable patient 
with mental health issues that were difficult to treat. Between 2003 and February 2009, Dr. 
Gagnon violated therapeutic boundaries with Patient A.  
 
In October 2011, Dr. Gagnon was found guilty by the Collège des médecins du Québec 
("CMQ"), the regulatory body for physicians and surgeons in Québec, of having breached the 
Code of Ethics of Physicians in relation to his conduct with and treatment of Patient A.  First, 
Dr. Gagnon was found to have transgressed the limits of the professional relationship, in 
particular after resuming psychotherapy with Patient A in 2003, and to have abused his position 
of authority with a vulnerable young person.  In particular, he failed to remain neutral and 
independent, and failed to reinforce respect for a strictly therapeutic environment.   He thereby 
breached and violated therapeutic boundaries, in an increasingly serious and intense manner, and 
allowed an emotionally intimate relationship with physical proximity to develop.   This was 
similar to a "father-daughter type of relationship".  
 
Dr. Gagnon was also found to have failed to take into account his own capacities and limits, in 
particular during the period from 2003 to 2009.  He failed to consult with a colleague or to take 
into account a colleague's opinion regarding his diagnosis and therapeutic approach for Patient A. 
 Dr. Gagnon failed to refer Patient A to a colleague or other health professional, in particular 
after May 2008, although she was not making progress in regards to her condition.   Dr. Gagnon 
consulted a colleague who treated his own distress with the situation. The CMQ found that Dr. 
Gagnon's relationship with Patient A was without any sexual connotation.   
 
Dr. Gagnon pleaded guilty to professional misconduct before the CMQ, which accepted a joint 
submission as to penalty.  As a result, the CMQ ordered that Dr. Gagnon be suspended for a 
period of three months, and that Dr. Gagnon publish, at his own expense, a notice of the CMQ 
decision in a newspaper in the area where he practised.  He was also ordered to pay costs of the 
proceeding against him.   
 
Therefore, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Gagnon's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      a.    Dr. Gagnon shall successfully complete, at his own expense and before the end of 
            2015, education approved by the College regarding boundaries in the 
            doctor-patient relationship.   
 
2.    Dr. Gagnon appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
3.    Dr. Gagnon pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $4,460.00 within 
      thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 16, 2014