Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gagnon, Micheline Danis Marie (CPSO#: 59850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Fontbonne Building F329
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6124
Fax: (905) 521-6103
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. D. Gagnon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gagnon ( CPSO# 59850 )

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
362 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
Fontbonne Building F329
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6124

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELINE DANIS MARIE GAGNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAGNON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1991