Gagovski, Vlade Mitre (CPSO#: 56041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, Macedonian, Serbian

Education:Medical Academy Sofia, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
19 Waterman Avenue
Toronto ON  M4B 1Y2
Phone: (416) 385-9900
Fax: (416) 385-9907
Electoral District: 10

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 03 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 03 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 3, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Vlade Mitre Gagovski,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Gagovski to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. VLADE MITRE GAGOVSKI
                                          ("Dr. Gagovski")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Gagovski, certificate of registration number 56041, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  into my standard of practice. Further to the investigation the ICR
                  Committee required in their November 16, 2016 decision, that I undergo a
                  specified continued education or remediation program ("SCERP").

            (4)   I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that the terms of this Undertaking replace
                  my obligations as set out in the November 16, 2016 SCERP.


            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (6)   Practice Restrictions 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake that I will not use metronomic
                        chemotherapy with insulin potentiation in the treatment of cancer
                        patients.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake to restrict my Complementary/Alternative
                        Medicine practice to disease prevention/screening/early detection
                        of recurrent disease and to the provision of nutritional, metabolic
                        and dietary therapies and advice to patients including the
                        provision of nutritional infusions containing vitamins and
                        minerals. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake to provide a referral to an oncologist
                        to every patient I treat who has been diagnosed with cancer and who
                        is not under the active care of an oncologist.
                  
            (7)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting
                        room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
                        secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "A."  For further
                        clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Gagovski has agreed
                        not to use metronomic chemotherapy with insulin potentiation in the
                        treatment of cancer patients. He has restricted his Complementary/
                        Alternative Medicine practice to disease prevention/screening/early
                        detection of recurrent disease and to the provision of nutritional,
                        metabolic and dietary therapies and advice to patients including
                        the provision of nutritional infusions containing vitamins and
                        minerals.
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in
                        any language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described
                        in section (7)(a) in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                        set out at Appendix "A." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (7)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (7)(b) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (7)(d).
                  
            (8)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "B", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "C";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Directly observe patient encounters for  1/2 day, once every
                              month;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting, or if there are less than fifteen patient encounters
                              since the last meeting, review all Complementary/Alternative
                              Medicine encounters;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every two
                              (2) months, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                              has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "C", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report(s) of the
                        medical inspector, and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "B" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake to ensure that Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "B" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (8)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (8)
                        above and Appendix "B" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of
                        the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake that, following the decision referenced
                        in section (9)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of
                        the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Gagovski, hereby consent to the following being included on
                        the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (9)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gagovski, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Gagovski, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "D" and Appendix "E",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (16)  I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Gagovski, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Gagovski's
                              standard of practice As a result of the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Gagovski has agreed not to use metronomic
                                    chemotherapy with insulin potentiation in the treatment
                                    of cancer patients. He has restricted his practice to
                                    disease prevention/screening/early detection of
                                    recurrent disease and to the provision of nutritional,
                                    metabolic and dietary therapies and  advice to patients
                                    including the provision of nutritional infusions
                                    containing vitamins and minerals.
                  
                                    Dr. Gagovski will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6
                                    months. 
                  
                                    Dr. Gagovski's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the
                                    end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Gagovski, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Gagovski, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Gagovski, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "B" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or 
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention and which they reasonably believe
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 3, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Vlade Mitre Gagovski to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 3, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Gagovski’s standard of practice As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Gagovski has agreed not to use metronomic chemotherapy with insulin potentiation in the treatment of cancer patients. He has restricted his practice to disease prevention/screening/early detection of recurrent disease and to the provision of nutritional, metabolic and dietary therapies and advice to patients including the provision of nutritional infusions containing vitamins and minerals.

Dr. Gagovski will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Gagovski’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.